EP0887933 - Turn off circuit for an LDMOS in presence of a reverse current [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza MI / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza MI / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tarantola, Mario Via Don Carlo Riva, 7 20010 Bareggio / IT | 02 /
Cantone, Giuseppe Via Filisto, 123 96100 Siracusa / IT | 03 /
Genova, Angelo Via Alpi, 169 93010 Delia / IT | 04 /
Gariboldi, Roberto Via F. Baracca, 6/3 20084 Lacchiarella / IT | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Pellegri, Alberto, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Pellegri, Alberto, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Puccini, 7 21100 Varese / IT | Application number, filing date | 97830298.2 | 24.06.1997 | [1999/01] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0887933 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/06 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
H03K17/063 (EP,US);
H03K2217/0018 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/36] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schaltung zum Abschalten eines LDMOS-Transistors in Anwesenheit von einem Gegenstrom | [1999/01] | English: | Turn off circuit for an LDMOS in presence of a reverse current | [1999/01] | French: | Circuit d'extinction pour un transistor LDMOS en présence d'un courant inverse | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 29.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/21] | 13.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0294881 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 54 - column 7, line 13; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0655837 (SILICONIX INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 12, line 12 - column 13, line 34; figure 16 *; | [A]EP0335217 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 11, line 24 - line 51; figure 5 *; | [DA]EP0743752 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9427370 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1 |