EP0823298 - A process and an apparatus for the production of pile-up lids, and lids obtained thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEDA S.p.A. Corso Salvatore d'Amato 84 80022 Arzano Napoli / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | For all designated states SEDA S.p.A. Corso Salvatore d'Amato 84 I-80022 Arzano-Napoli / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'Amato, Gianfranco Via Domenico Fontana 27/7 80128 Naples / IT | [1998/07] | Representative(s) | Tonon, Gilberto, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 38-39 00186 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | Tonon, Gilberto, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 97830411.1 | 04.08.1997 | [1998/07] | Priority number, date | IT1996RM00572 | 09.08.1996 Original published format: IT RM960572 | [1998/07] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0823298 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0823298 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0823298 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B21D51/44, B21D51/38 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
B21D51/44 (EP,US);
Y10S425/127 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/07] | B21D51/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen gestapelter Deckel und so hergestellte Deckel | [1998/07] | English: | A process and an apparatus for the production of pile-up lids, and lids obtained thereby | [1998/07] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la production de couvercles empilés et couvercles ainsi obtenus | [1998/07] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 10.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2177027 (PLUMB WALTER G) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US2271107 (SWANGREN KARL E) [A] 1,2,14 * the whole document *; | [A]US3104045 (ALBERT BRUSCHINI, et al); | [XA]US3447734 (WILCOX ISAAC L) [X] 14 * the whole document * [A] 1,2; | [X]US4351472 (EDDY WILLIAM R) [X] 14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4429057 (HOERAUF MICHAEL MASCHF [DE]) |