EP0915508 - Integrated circuit with highly efficient junction insulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pozzoni, Massimo Via Gerla, 9 27100 Pavia / IT | 02 /
Galbiati, Maria Paola Via Mozart, 3 20052 Monza (Milano) / IT | 03 /
Palmieri, Michele Via Ciniselli, 13 20019 Settimo Milanese (Milano) / IT | 04 /
Pedrazzini, Giorgio Via Fossarmato, 88 27100 Pavia / IT | 05 /
Rossi, Domenico Via Roma, 159 27024 Cilavegna (Pavia) / IT | [1999/19] | Representative(s) | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/14] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al JACOBACCI & PARTNERS S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/12] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al JACOBACCI & PARTNERS S.p.A. Via delle Quattro Fontane, 15 00184 Roma / IT | ||
Former [1999/19] | Maggioni, Claudio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 97830507.6 | 10.10.1997 | [1999/19] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0915508 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/761 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
H01L21/761 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/03] |
Former [1999/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Integrierte Schaltung mit hocheffizienter Isolation durch PN-Übergang | [1999/19] | English: | Integrated circuit with highly efficient junction insulation | [1999/19] | French: | Circuit intégré à isolation par jonction très efficace | [1999/19] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 22.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/38] | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2175138 (SGS MICROELETTRONICA SPA) [X] 1,2 * figure 5 *; | [XA]DE3725429 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 2 * [A] 2; | [A]EP0339732 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]) [A] 1,2* figure 8 *; | [XA]EP0420672 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1 * figure 3; claims 7,10 * [A] 3; | [XA]US5179432 (HUSHER JOHN [US]) [X] 1,3 * figure 3; claims 1-5 * [A] 2 |