Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0886049
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
14.08.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] |
26.07.2002 |
Refusal of application |
published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] |
04.04.2002 |
Application refused |
|
03.01.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
16.10.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
24.07.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.06.2001 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
12.05.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.04.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.04.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.02.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.02.2001 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
27.12.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
28.11.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.11.2000 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
27.10.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] |
21.10.2000 |
First examination report |
|
19.10.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.10.2000 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
08.09.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.10.2000 [2000/43] |
31.08.2000 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
18.02.2000 |
Publication of search report |
published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] |
24.11.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.11.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] |