Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0886049 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2000 | A3 | EP0886049 | 23.12.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | ITTO970121 | 17.06.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT236278Y | 08.08.2000 | Y1 | ITTO970121U | 17.12.1998 | U1 | ITTO970121V0 | 17.06.1997 | V0 | Priority number | Date | ITTO970121 | 17.06.1997 |