EP0886049 - Auxiliary air filtering device for the cooling apparatus of an agricultural tractor engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAME DEUTZ-FAHR S.P.A. Viale F. Cassani, 14 24047 Treviglio (Bergamo) / IT | [1998/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hampel, Gerald Viale F. Cassani, 15 24047 Treviglio (Bergamo) / IT | [1998/52] | Representative(s) | Buzzi, Franco, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Buzzi, Franco, et al c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1998/52] | Buzzi, Franco, et al c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl, Corso Fiume, 6 10133 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 97830597.7 | 14.11.1997 | [1998/52] | Priority number, date | IT1997TO00121U | 17.06.1997 Original published format: IT TO970121 U | [1998/52] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0886049 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0886049 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F01P11/12 | [1998/52] | CPC: |
F01P11/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/50] |
Former [1998/52] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zusatzvorrichtung zur Luftfilterung für das Kühlungsgerät einer Maschine eines Landwirtschaftstraktors | [1998/52] | English: | Auxiliary air filtering device for the cooling apparatus of an agricultural tractor engine | [1998/52] | French: | Dispositif auxiliaire de filtration d'air pour l'appareil de refroidisssement d' un tracteur agricole | [1998/52] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 09.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 06.10.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 31.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 09.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/37] | 18.04.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.11.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5490574 (ISHIIZUMI SEIICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * column W *; | [X]JPH0616052 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940420), vol. 018, no. 220, Database accession no. (M - 1595), & JP06016052 A 19940125 (KUBOTA CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * |