EP0829670 - Hose coupler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTON PERFORMANCE PLASTICS CORPORATION 150 Dey Road Wayne New Jersey 07470 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states NORTON PERFORMANCE PLASTICS CORPORATION 150 Dey Road Wayne, New Jersey 07470 / US | ||
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states Sanitary Couplers Inc. 696 Pleasant Valley Drive Springboro, Ohio 45066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zornow, Jeffrey S. 389 Grassy Creek Way Centerville, Ohio 45458 / US | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/47] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/12] | Hellbom, Lars Olof H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, Box 3137 103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 97850003.1 | 10.01.1997 | [1998/12] | Priority number, date | US19960719090 | 17.09.1996 Original published format: US 719090 | [1998/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0829670 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0829670 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | [1998/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0829670 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/24 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
F16L33/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/12] | Extension states | AL | 31.01.1997 | LT | 31.01.1997 | LV | 31.01.1997 | RO | 31.01.1997 | SI | 31.01.1997 | Title | German: | Schlauchverbindung | [1998/12] | English: | Hose coupler | [1998/12] | French: | Raccord de tuyaux souples | [1998/12] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 31.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.09.2002 | BE | 11.09.2002 | CH | 11.09.2002 | FI | 11.09.2002 | GR | 11.09.2002 | LI | 11.09.2002 | NL | 11.09.2002 | DK | 11.12.2002 | SE | 11.12.2002 | PT | 17.12.2002 | ES | 28.03.2003 | [2015/47] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
FI | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
DK | 11.12.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
FI | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
FI | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
DE | 12.12.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
FI | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
DE | 12.12.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
FI | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | FI | 11.09.2002 | |
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | FI | 11.09.2002 | |
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | FI | 11.09.2002 | |
SE | 11.12.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2452908 (IRVING COWLES) [A] 1 * figure 4 *; | [A]FR1043634 (HB ETS) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]FR1052094 (ILE D ETUDES D APP S ET D EQUI) [A] 1,4,5 * figure 1 *; | [A]GB715527 (CHARLES ALBERT EDWARD OLDHAM) [A] 1,5,6 * figure 1 *; | [YA]FR1208594 (LEFEBVRE) [Y] 1 * page 1, column R, line 9 - line 11; figure 1 * [A] 2-4; | [A]GB844498 (AIRTECH LTD) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US5240291 (ZORNOW JEFFREY S [US]) [DA] 5-11 * abstract *; | [DA]US5393104 (ZORNOW JEFFREY S [US]); | [YA] - SASS ET AL, Dubbel's Taschenbuch für den Maschinenbau, BERLIN, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1955), XP002051543 [Y] 1 * page 605, line 1 - line 2 * [A] 2,3 | by applicant | US5240291 | US5393104 |