EP0808909 - A process for production of a steel component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ovako Steel AB 813 82 Hofors / SE | [1997/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andersson, Jan-Erik Gaspeldoorn 14 NL-3984 AX Odijk / NL | [1997/49] |
Former [1997/48] | 01 /
Andersson, Jan-Erik Vasagatan 3 B 791 31 Falun / SE | Representative(s) | Westman, Per Börje Ingemar SKF Group Headquarters Innovation & Patents 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | Westman, P. Börje I. SKF Group Headquarters Innovation & Patents S-415 50 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 97850079.1 | 14.05.1997 | [1997/48] | Priority number, date | SE19960001912 | 21.05.1996 Original published format: SE 9601912 | [1997/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0808909 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0808909 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C21D1/10, C21D6/00 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
C21D1/10 (EP,US);
C21D6/002 (EP,US);
C21D2221/10 (EP,US);
Y02P10/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Stahlwerkstücken | [1997/48] | English: | A process for production of a steel component | [1997/48] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de pièces en acier | [1997/48] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/30] | 16.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1441317 (KUGELFISCHER G SCHAEFER & CO) [X] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2190926 (HEHL KARL [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE2449237 (AEG ELOTHERM GMBH) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1069222 (RENAULT); | [A]US2326674 (PAVITT HARRY A); | [A]JPH07238348 ; | [A]JPH06128700 ; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960131), vol. 96, no. 1, & JP07238348 A 19950912 (SANYO SPECIAL STEEL CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940811), vol. 018, no. 430, Database accession no. (C - 1236), & JP06128700 A 19940510 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - BOGOLYUBSKII S D ET AL, "EFFECT OF DIFFERENT HEAT TREATMENT REGIMES ON THE STRUCTURE AND PROPERTIES OF MARTENSITIC STEEL 90KH18M", METAL SCIENCE AND HEAT TREATMENT, (19910101), vol. 33, no. 1 / 02, pages 45 - 50, XP000261881 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00775035 |