Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0804982 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0804982



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 128
01.10.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
14.02.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
27.01.2003 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 3
27.01.2003 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 2
17.10.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.09.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.09.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
24.09.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
20.09.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 7
13.06.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
06.06.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
30.01.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
30.01.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
30.01.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
29.06.2001 Description Search / examination 1
29.06.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.04.2001 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
27.04.2001 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
18.11.2000 Claims Search / examination 3
18.11.2000 Description Search / examination 4
18.11.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
06.10.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
22.09.2000 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 2
22.09.2000 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 2
27.07.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
01.03.2000 Claims Search / examination 1
01.03.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
07.12.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
29.09.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.09.1997 European search report Search / examination 3
13.06.1997 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
11.06.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
10.06.1997 Invitation to pay claims fees Search / examination 1
21.05.1997 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
21.05.1997 Priority document Search / examination 14
18.04.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.04.1997 Claims Search / examination 3
18.04.1997 Description Search / examination 10
18.04.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.04.1997 Drawings Search / examination 4
18.04.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7