blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0804982

EP0804982 - Process for preparing metal foam parts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.11.2003  [2003/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ustav materiálov a mechaniky strojov Slovenskej akadémie vied
Racianska 75
83102 Bratislava / SK
[N/P]
Former [2003/14]For all designated states
Ustav materiálov a mechaniky strojov Slovenskej akadémie vied
Racianska 75
83102 Bratislava / SK
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
Neuman AG
Spiesergasse 11
9004 St. Gallen / CH
Former [1997/45]For all designated states
Leichtmetallguss-Kokillenbau-Werk Illichmann GmbH
Grossalmstrasse 5
4813 Altmünster / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Simancik, Frantisek, Dr.-Ing.
Pecnianska 13
851 01 Bratislava / SL
02 / Schörghuber, Franz, Dipl.-Ing.
Grossalmstrasse 5
4813 Altmünster / AT
03 / Hartl, Erich Ing.
Grassalmstrasse 5
4813 Altmünster / AT
[1997/45]
Representative(s)Müllner, Erwin, et al
Patentanwälte Müllner, Katschinka, Müllner Weihburggasse 9 Postfach 159
1014 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [1997/45]Müllner, Erwin, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Dr. Erwin Müllner Dipl.-Ing. Werner Katschinka Postfach 159 Weihburggasse 9
1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date97890073.618.04.1997
[1997/45]
Priority number, dateAT1996000071919.04.1996         Original published format: AT 71996
[1997/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0804982
Date:05.11.1997
Language:DE
[1997/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0804982
Date:12.11.1997
[1997/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0804982
Date:27.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.1997
ClassificationIPC:B22F3/11
[1997/45]
CPC:
B22F3/1125 (EP,US); B22F2999/00 (EP,US)
C-Set:
B22F2999/00, B22F3/1125, B22F3/105 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1997/45]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Formteilen aus Metallschaum[1997/45]
English:Process for preparing metal foam parts[1997/45]
French:Procédé de préparation d'ébauches de mousse métallique[1997/45]
Examination procedure23.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/13]
07.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
29.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.09.2002Fee for grant paid
16.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
18.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE27.02.2003
[2003/19]
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0460392  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [AD] 1-14* claims 2,3,11,12 *;
 [X]DE4424157  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 36; claims 2,4,6 *;
 [AD]DE4326982  (ALCAN GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-14 * claim 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.