Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH10199855 | Global Dossier | 31.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | AT173496 | 01.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0834908 | Global Dossier | 08.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT173496 | 01.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT408287B | 25.10.2001 | B | ATA173496 | 15.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | AT173496 | 01.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR19980032452 | 25.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | AT173496 | 01.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW423069B | 21.02.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | AT173496 | 01.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6016612 | 25.01.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | AT173496 | 01.10.1996 |