EP0886958 - VISION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/01] | VISION SYSTEM AND PROXIMITY DETECTOR | ||
[1999/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2002 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANADIAN SPACE AGENCY 6767 Route de l'Aéroport Saint-Hubert Quebec J3Y 8Y9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states CANADIAN SPACE AGENCY 6767 Route de l'Aéroport Saint-Hubert, Quebec J3Y 8Y9 / CA | ||
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states Chapman, Glenn H. 637 Ebert Avenue Coquitlam, British Columbia V3J 2L1 / CA | ||
For all designated states Immega, Guy, B. 4356 Jericho Circle Vancouver, British Columbia V6R 1E9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chapman, Glenn H. 637 Ebert Avenue Coquitlam, British Columbia V3J 2L1 / CA | 02 /
Immega, Guy B. 4356 JerichoCircle Vancouver, British Columbia V6R 1E9 / CA | [2000/28] |
Former [1999/01] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Newell, William Joseph, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | Newell, William Joseph, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/28] | Selby-Lowndes, Guy Francis Charles, et al Moonrakers Durfold Wood Plaistow Billingshurst West Sussex RH14 0PL / GB | ||
Former [1999/01] | Selby-Lowndes, Guy Francis Charles Moonrakers Durfold Wood Plaistow Billingshurst West Sussex RH14 0PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97900176.5 | 17.01.1997 | [1999/01] | WO1997CA00026 | Priority number, date | US19960588319 | 18.01.1996 Original published format: US 588319 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9726752 | Date: | 24.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0886958 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0886958 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, G06K9/00 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
H03K17/941 (EP,US);
G06V40/1312 (EP,US);
G01S17/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1999/01] | Title | German: | SICHTSYSTEM | [1999/12] | English: | VISION SYSTEM | [1999/12] | French: | SYSTEME DE VISION | [1999/12] |
Former [1999/01] | SICHTSYSTEM UND NÄHRUNGSDETEKTOR | ||
Former [1999/01] | VISION SYSTEM AND PROXIMITY DETECTOR | ||
Former [1999/01] | SYSTEME DE VISION ET DETECTEUR DE PROXIMITE | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/53] | 24.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.08.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 07.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/13] | Request for further processing for: | 19.08.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 19.08.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.08.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.09.1998 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   15.10.1998 | 28.09.1998 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   15.10.1998 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.09.1998 | M01   Fee paid on   15.10.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US3327584 (KISSINGER CURTIS D) [Y] 1-3,6 [A] 8,26-28; | [YA]US4498767 (MCGOVERN WILLIAM E [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,6,7,26-28 [A] 17,18,22; | [A]DE3712089 (SINGH JASPAL [DE]) [A] 1,28; | [XA]US4785171 (DOWLING JR ROBERT F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,26 [A] 5; | [XA]US4932776 (DOWLING JR ROBERT F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,26,28 [A] 3-5,8-17,22; | [YA]EP0372748 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,6,7,26,27,28 [A] 3-5,8-17,22; | [A]US5153715 (BENDER GEORGE L [US], et al)[A] 1,2,5,6,8,26; | [XA]JPH06325158 (NEC CORP) [X] 1-3,5,6 [A] 26 |