EP1019108 - MACROPOROUS COMPOSITE FOR CARRYING ONE OR MORE MEDICINAL SUBSTANCES AND FOR USE AS A BONE RECONSTRUCTION MATERIAL, AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE RENNES I 2, rue du Thabor F-35000 Rennes / FR | [2000/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUCAS, Anita 113, avenue Aristide-Briand F-35000 Rennes / FR | 02 /
MICHEL, Jean-François 19, rue Victor-Bash F-35700 Rennes / FR | 03 /
GAUDE, Jean 13, avenue des Onglées F-35690 Acigné / FR | 04 /
CAREL, Claude 27A, cours Rapha[l-Binet F-35000 Rennes / FR | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Patrice Vidon, Immeuble Germanium, 80, Avenue des Buttes-de-Coesmes 35700 Rennes / FR | Application number, filing date | 97900225.0 | 02.01.1997 | [2000/29] | WO1997FR00007 | Priority number, date | FR19960000560 | 15.01.1996 Original published format: FR 9600560 | [2000/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9726024 | Date: | 24.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1019108 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1019108 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/00 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
A61L27/025 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L2300/406 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | MAKROPORÖSES KOMPOSIT ALS TRÄGERSUBSTANZ FÜR MEDIKAMENTE UND ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS KNOCHENERSATZMATERIAL | [2000/29] | English: | MACROPOROUS COMPOSITE FOR CARRYING ONE OR MORE MEDICINAL SUBSTANCES AND FOR USE AS A BONE RECONSTRUCTION MATERIAL, AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME | [2000/29] | French: | COMPOSITE MACROPOREUX SUPPORT DE SUBSTANCE(S) MEDICAMENTEUSE(S) UTILISABLE COMME MATERIAU DE RECONSTITUTION OSSEUSE ET PROCEDE D'ELABORATION | [2000/29] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.07.1998 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 07.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.2002 | FI | 02.05.2002 | GR | 02.05.2002 | IE | 02.05.2002 | DK | 02.08.2002 | PT | 02.08.2002 | LU | 02.01.2003 | MC | 31.01.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/40] | AT | 02.05.2002 | |
FI | 02.05.2002 | ||
GR | 02.05.2002 | ||
IE | 02.05.2002 | ||
DK | 02.08.2002 | ||
PT | 02.08.2002 | ||
LU | 02.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 02.05.2002 | |
GR | 02.05.2002 | ||
IE | 02.05.2002 | ||
DK | 02.08.2002 | ||
PT | 02.08.2002 | ||
LU | 02.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 02.05.2002 | |
GR | 02.05.2002 | ||
IE | 02.05.2002 | ||
DK | 02.08.2002 | ||
PT | 02.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 02.05.2002 | |
GR | 02.05.2002 | ||
IE | 02.05.2002 | ||
PT | 02.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | AT | 02.05.2002 | |
GR | 02.05.2002 | ||
IE | 02.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 02.05.2002 | |
IE | 02.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 02.05.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3890107 (WHITE EUGENE W, et al) [A] 1-12 * examples 1-3; claim - *; | [A]EP0022724 (ANVAR [FR]) [A] 1-12 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0159087 (STICHTING BIOMATERIALS SCIENCE [NL]) [A] 1-12 * claim - *; | [A]WO8707826 (CAMPRASSE SERGE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]EP0395187 (INTERPORE INTERNATIONAL [US]) [A] 1-12 * claim - *; | [DA]WO9426322 (INOTEB [FR], et al) [DA] 1* claim - * |