EP0876579 - AERIAL TARGET SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.2001 [2001/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meggitt Defence Systems Limited Farrs House, Cowgrove Wimborne Dorset BH21 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | For all designated states Meggitt Defence Systems Limited Farrs House, Cowgrove Wimborne, Dorset BH21 4EL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEWMAN, Philip Brick on Edge Cottage, Rhee Wall, Station Road Appledore, Kent TN26 2DE / GB | 02 /
RICHARDSON, Alan 51 Tadworth Road, Kennington Ashford, Kent TN24 9JU / GB | [1998/46] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97900277.1 | 06.01.1997 | [1998/46] | WO1997GB00024 | Priority number, date | GB19960001207 | 22.01.1996 Original published format: GB 9601207 | [1998/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9727446 | Date: | 31.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0876579 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0876579 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F41J2/02, F41J9/08 | [1998/46] | CPC: |
F41J2/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [1998/46] | Title | German: | IN DER LUFT FLIEGENDES ZIEL | [1998/46] | English: | AERIAL TARGET SYSTEM | [1998/46] | French: | SYSTEME DE CIBLE AERIENNE | [1998/46] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/46] | 09.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1506045 (HAYES INTERNATIONAL CORP.) [X] 1-3,5-7,10-12,14-16 * page 2, paragraphs 2-3 * * page 5, paragraph 5 - page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 10, paragraph 3 - page 11, paragraph 1 * * page 13, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 *; | [X]GB1454893 (MC DONNEL AIRCRAFT CORP.) [X] 1-3,5-7,10-12,14-16 * page 2, lines 14-18; figure 1 * * page 2, lines 41-121 *; | [A]US4428583 (HAYES INTERNATIONAL CORP.); | [A]US4607849 (D. SMITH ET AL); | [A]US2869120 (O. LOLMAUGH ET AL) |