EP0816519 - HOT ROLLED Cr-Ni STAINLESS STEEL PLATE OF LOW ANISOTROPY AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-71 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-71 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERAOKA, Shinichi, Nippon Steel Corporation HikariWorks, 3434, Oaza-Shimata Hikari City, Yamaguchi 743 / JP | 02 /
ISHIMARU, Eiichiro, Nippon Steel Corporation Hikari Works, 3434, Oaza-Shimata Hikari City, Yamaguchi 743 / JP | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/02] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97900426.4 | 16.01.1997 | [1998/02] | WO1997JP00067 | Priority number, date | JP19960006059 | 17.01.1996 Original published format: JP 605996 | [1998/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9726378 | Date: | 24.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0816519 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0816519 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.07.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/02, C21D9/46, C22C38/40 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
C21D8/02 (KR);
C21D8/0205 (EP,US);
C21D8/0263 (EP,US);
C21D9/46 (KR);
C22C38/40 (KR);
C21D8/0226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/02] | Title | German: | WARMGEWALZTES CR-NI-EDELSTAHLBLECH MIT NIEDRIGER ANISOTROPIE UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2001/30] | English: | HOT ROLLED Cr-Ni STAINLESS STEEL PLATE OF LOW ANISOTROPY AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [1998/02] | French: | TOLE D'ACIER INOXYDABLE Cr-Ni LAMINEE A CHAUD DE FAIBLE ANISOTROPIE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [1998/02] |
Former [1998/02] | WARMGEWALZTE ROSTFREIE CR-Ni-STAHLPLATTE MIT NIEDRIGER ANISOTROPIE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.1997 | Translation filed | 26.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.1997 | Search fee paid | 26.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 14.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 05.03.2002 | DE | 06.03.2002 | [2003/30] |
Former [2003/17] | GB | 05.03.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0638653 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * claim 2 *; | [A]JPH02133528 ; | [A]JPH02166233 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900807), vol. 014, no. 363, Database accession no. (C - 0746), & JP02133528 A 19900522 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900917), vol. 014, no. 431, Database accession no. (C - 0759), & JP02166233 A 19900626 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 2 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH07268460 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JPH01240618 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JPS63421 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) |