EP0874947 - CORE SAMPLING METHOD AND CORE SAMPLER THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072-5299 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072-5299 / US | ||
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 2601 Beltline Road Carrollton, TX 75006 / US | ||
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states Dresser Industries, Inc. 41st floor, 2001 Ross Avenue Dallas, TX 75201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANUEL, Philippe 18, rue du Bourgmestre B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | 02 /
HOLT, Rune Johan Falkbergets v. 6D N-7021 Trondheim / NO | 03 /
KENTER, Cor Bottelrooss 4 NL-2317 EZ Leiden / NL | 04 /
BRIGNOLI, Marco Via Cazzaniga, 37 I-20047 Brugherio / IT | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Van Reet, Joseph, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Van Reet, Joseph, et al Gevers Patents S.A., Brussels Airport Business Park, Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 97900512.1 | 15.01.1997 | [1998/45] | WO1997BE00005 | Priority number, date | BE19960000033 | 15.01.1996 Original published format: BE 9600033 | [1998/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9726439 | Date: | 24.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0874947 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0874947 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E21B25/00, E21B25/08 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
E21B25/08 (EP,US);
E21B25/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/45] | Title | German: | KERNBOHRVERFAHREN UND KERNBOHRWERKZEUG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [1998/45] | English: | CORE SAMPLING METHOD AND CORE SAMPLER THEREFOR | [1998/45] | French: | PROCEDE DE CAROTTAGE ET CAROTTIER POUR SA MISE EN OEUVRE | [1998/45] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 14.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33] | Request for further processing for: | 21.08.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 21.08.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.09.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3548958 (BLACKWELL ROBERT J, et al) [X] 1 * column W *; | [X]US4479557 (PARK ARTHUR [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 4, line 2 - line 7; figure - *; | [A]US3207240 (HELMUT HUGEL) [A] 1-5,11 * column W *; | [A]US2147896 (HARRINGTON GEORGE G) [A] 1,2,5 * figure - *; | [A]US3818997 (BRIDWELL H) [A] 1,5 * figure - *; | [A]US2633336 (STOKES JOHN C) |