30.10.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] |
15.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
26.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] |
26.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] |
11.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
30.08.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] |
17.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] |
19.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
28.07.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] |
01.06.2001 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] |
02.02.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] |
26.01.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] |
14.07.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.08.2000 [2000/35] |
12.05.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] |
20.04.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2000 [2000/23] |
05.11.1999 |
Change - representative |
published on 22.12.1999 [1999/51] |
30.07.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.09.1999 [1999/37] |
22.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.05.1999 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.06.1999 [1999/25] |
16.02.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
16.02.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.01.1999 |
First examination report |
|
06.01.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.01.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
27.03.1998 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.05.1998 [1998/20] |
24.12.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.02.1998 [1998/07] |
24.12.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.02.1998 [1998/07] |
04.12.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.12.1997 |
Change - extension states |
|
14.10.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.09.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.02.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|