EP0822878 - PIPE-CUTTING AND CHAMFERING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georg Fischer Rohrverbindungstechnik GmbH Freibühlstrasse 18 78224 Singen / DE | [1998/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAHR, Markus Am Breitenstein 17 D-78244 Gottmadingen / DE | [1998/07] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Wolfgang Georg Fischer AG Patentabteilung Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | [2009/49] |
Former [1999/51] | Weiss, Wolfgang c/o Georg Fischer AG Patentabteilung - MFB 2661 Amsler-Laffonstrasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [1999/25] | Weibel, Beat, et al c/o Georg Fischer AG, Patentabteilung 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [1998/20] | Rottmann, Maximilian R., et al c/o Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Glattalstrasse 37 8052 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1998/07] | Szilagyi, Marianne Georg Fischer Management AG Patentabteilung Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | Application number, filing date | 97900536.0 | 28.01.1997 | [1998/07] | WO1997CH00024 | Priority number, date | DE1996103361 | 31.01.1996 Original published format: DE 19603361 | [1998/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9727969 | Date: | 07.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0822878 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0822878 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B23D45/12 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
B23D21/04 (EP,US);
B23D45/12 (KR);
B23B5/16 (EP,US);
B23D45/006 (EP,US);
B23D45/126 (EP,US);
B23D47/04 (EP,US);
B24B9/007 (EP,US);
B24B9/04 (EP,US);
B27B33/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/07] | Extension states | RO | 02.10.1997 | Title | German: | ROHRTRENN- UND ANFASVORRICHTUNG | [1998/07] | English: | PIPE-CUTTING AND CHAMFERING ARRANGEMENT | [1998/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR SEPARER DES TUBES ET REALISER DES CHANFREINS | [1998/07] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/07] | 08.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 15.09.1999 | FI | 15.09.1999 | GR | 15.09.1999 | NL | 15.09.1999 | SE | 15.09.1999 | DK | 15.12.1999 | PT | 15.12.1999 | AT | 28.01.2000 | LU | 28.01.2000 | BE | 31.01.2000 | MC | 31.01.2000 | [2007/29] |
Former [2004/07] | ES | 15.09.1999 | |
FI | 15.09.1999 | ||
GR | 15.09.1999 | ||
NL | 15.09.1999 | ||
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
DK | 15.12.1999 | ||
PT | 15.12.1999 | ||
AT | 28.01.2000 | ||
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
MC | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2003/46] | ES | 15.09.1999 | |
FI | 15.09.1999 | ||
NL | 15.09.1999 | ||
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
DK | 15.12.1999 | ||
PT | 15.12.1999 | ||
AT | 28.01.2000 | ||
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
MC | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | ES | 15.09.1999 | |
FI | 15.09.1999 | ||
NL | 15.09.1999 | ||
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
PT | 15.12.1999 | ||
AT | 28.01.2000 | ||
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
MC | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | ES | 15.09.1999 | |
FI | 15.09.1999 | ||
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
PT | 15.12.1999 | ||
AT | 28.01.2000 | ||
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
MC | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2002/27] | ES | 15.09.1999 | |
FI | 15.09.1999 | ||
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
PT | 15.12.1999 | ||
AT | 28.01.2000 | ||
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | FI | 15.09.1999 | |
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
PT | 15.12.1999 | ||
AT | 28.01.2000 | ||
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2001/37] | FI | 15.09.1999 | |
IE | 15.09.1999 | ||
PT | 15.12.1999 | ||
AT | 28.01.2000 | ||
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | FI | 15.09.1999 | |
IE | 15.09.1999 | ||
PT | 15.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2001/12] | IE | 15.09.1999 | |
PT | 15.12.1999 | ||
FI | 16.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | PT | 15.12.1999 | |
FI | 16.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/26] | PT | 15.12.1999 | |
FI | 16.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | FI | 16.12.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1171241 (FISCHER AG GEORG) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [A]DE3521697 (KUBO TETSUSHI) [A] 1-4 * page 12, line 13 - page 13, line 24; figures 1,2,10,12-14; claim 1 *; | [X]WO9103341 (BIRKESTRAND ORVILLE J [US]) [X] 1,3 * abstract *; | [A]EP0513524 (FISCHER GEORG ROHRLEITUNG [CH]) [A] 1-3 * figure 2; claims 1,3,8 * |