EP0901217 - CONTROLLER FOR MOTOR-DRIVEN POWER STEERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [1999/10] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKATSUKA, Yuji-Mitsubishi Elec. Software Co., Ltd 1-2, Hamayama-dori 6-chome,Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652 / JP | 02 /
WADA, Shunichi-Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | [1999/10] | Representative(s) | von Fischern, Bernhard, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann - Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97900764.8 | 23.01.1997 | [1999/10] | WO1997JP00149 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9833270 | Date: | 30.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0901217 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0901217 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.07.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H02P7/00, B62D5/04, B62D6/00 | [1999/10] | CPC: |
B62D5/049 (EP,US);
B62D5/0436 (EP,US);
B62D5/0484 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/10] | Title | German: | REGLER FÜR MOTORISCH-ANGETRIEBENE SERVOLENKUNG | [1999/12] | English: | CONTROLLER FOR MOTOR-DRIVEN POWER STEERING | [1999/10] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE POUR DIRECTION ASSISTEE PAR MOTEUR | [1999/10] |
Former [1999/10] | STEUERUNG FÜR MOTORISCHANGETRIEBENE SERVOLENKUNG | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.1998 | Translation filed | 23.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.1998 | Search fee paid | 23.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.1998 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 15.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06024185.8 / EP1764905 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0536590 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0706930 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [A] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5552684 (WADA SHUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,4* the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS5277348 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPS57118693U ; | [Y]JPH0340781 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JPH06261585 (TOYO ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0891240 (NIPPON SEIKO KK) | Examination | US5357181 | by applicant | JPH0891240 |