EP0825167 - COMPOUNDS AND SURFACTANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-35, Higashiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-35, Higashiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMIYA, Kaoru, c/o Asahi Denka Kogyo K.K. 2-35, Higashiogu 7-chome, Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116 / JP | 02 /
KAWAMATA, Hiromasa, c/o Asahi Denka Kogyo K.K. 2-35, Higashiogu 7-chome, Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116 / JP | 03 /
UMEZAWA, Shohei, c/o Asahi Denka Kogyo K.K. 22-35, Higashiogu 7-chome, Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116 / JP | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | Waldren, Robin Michael Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | Waldren, Robin Michael MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97900791.1 | 28.01.1997 | [1998/09] | WO1997JP00186 | Priority number, date | JP19960014441 | 30.01.1996 Original published format: JP 1444196 | JP19960023908 | 09.02.1996 Original published format: JP 2390896 | [1998/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9728111 | Date: | 07.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0825167 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0825167 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.08.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C43/178, C07C69/34, C07C69/66, C07C305/10, C07F9/09, C08G65/28, C08G65/32, C09K3/00, C08G65/26 | [1999/16] | CPC: |
C08G65/2639 (EP,US);
C07C43/178 (EP,KR,US);
C07C305/10 (EP,US);
C07C69/34 (KR);
C07C69/63 (EP,US);
C07F9/09 (KR);
C07F9/091 (EP,US);
C08G65/007 (EP,US);
C08G65/14 (EP,US);
C08G65/26 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/09] | C07C43/178, C07C69/34, C07C69/66, C07C305/10, C07F9/09, C08G65/28, C08G65/32, C09K3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1998/09] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN UND OBERFLÄCHLICHE STOFFE | [1998/09] | English: | COMPOUNDS AND SURFACTANTS | [1998/09] | French: | COMPOSES ET TENSIOACTIFS | [1998/09] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.1997 | Translation filed | 15.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.1997 | Search fee paid | 15.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/09] | 27.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]DE19634757 (KRUEGER ALFRED [DE]) [E] 1,3,7 * example 1; claims 1-3 * * page 3, column 3, line 45 - line 60 *; | [A]JPH0598213 ; | [A]JPH05279435 ; | [A]FR2697256 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * claims 1-4 *; | [A]US3468847 (DOORENBOS HAROLD E, et al) [A] 1-8 * examples 1,2 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 20, Database accession no. 93-164725, XP002094609 & JPH0598213 A 19930420 (NIKKA KAGAKU KK) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 47, Database accession no. 93-374631, XP002094610 & JPH05279435 A 19931026 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH06234858 (KAO CORP); | [X]JPH0632904 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) |