EP0907635 - HALOGEN SUBSTITUTED CARBAMATE COMPOUNDS FROM 2-PHENYL-1,2-ETHANEDIOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK Corporation 26-4 Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-ku Seoul 150-010 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | For all designated states SK Corporation 26-4 Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-ku, Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Yong, Moon 2 Van Duyne Court Towaco, NJ 07082 / US | 02 /
KIM, Min, Woo 6 Madison Court Montvale, NJ 07045 / US | 03 /
PARK, Jeong, Han Apartment No. 1 87 Oakwood Village Flanders, NJ 07836 / US | [1999/15] | Representative(s) | Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97900794.5 | 16.01.1997 | [1999/15] | WO1997KR00006 | Priority number, date | USA 586497 | 16.01.1996 | USA 781101 | 09.01.1997 | [2002/39] |
Former [2002/39] | US19960586497 | 16.01.1996 | |
[1999/15] | 26.02.1999 | ||
Former [1999/15] | USA 586497 | 16.01.1996 | |
USA | 09.01.1997 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9726241 | Date: | 24.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0907635 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0907635 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 24.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C271/10, A61K31/27 | [1999/15] | CPC: |
A61K31/27 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
C07C271/12 (EP,US);
C07B2200/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1999/15] | Title | German: | Halogensubstituierte Carbamatderivate von 2-Phenyl-1,2-ethandiol | [1999/15] | English: | HALOGEN SUBSTITUTED CARBAMATE COMPOUNDS FROM 2-PHENYL-1,2-ETHANEDIOL | [1999/15] | French: | COMPOSES AU CARBAMATE DE 2-PHENYL-1,2-ETHANEDIOL, A SUBSTITUTION D'HALOGENE | [1999/15] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 06.08.1998 | Examination requested [1999/15] | 09.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3265728 (BOSSINGER CHARLES D, et al); | [A]US3509162 (BESENDORF HEDWIG, et al) |