blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0974050

EP0974050 - BASOPHIL DEGRANULATION TEST [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 12.11.2008  [2008/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ORPEGEN Pharma GmbH
Czerny-Ring 22
69115 Heidelberg / DE
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / NEBE, Carl, Thomas
August-Frey-Weg 5
D-68526 Ladenburg / DE
02 / HARTMANN, Karin
Erlenweg 13
D-67158 Ellerstadt / DE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Weiss, Wolfgang, et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Weiss, Wolfgang, et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Former [2000/04]Weiss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Weickmann & Partner, Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date97901071.720.01.1997
[2000/04]
WO1997EP00251
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9832014
Date:23.07.1998
Language:DE
[1998/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974050
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974050
Date:25.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.07.1998
ClassificationIPC:G01N33/50, G01N33/68, G01N33/566, G01N33/58, G01N1/30
[2000/04]
CPC:
G01N33/5091 (EP,US); G01N33/5008 (EP,US); G01N33/502 (EP,US);
G01N33/5094 (EP,US); G01N33/566 (EP,US); G01N33/56972 (EP,US);
G01N33/6854 (EP,US); Y10S435/975 (EP,US); Y10S436/80 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/04]
TitleGerman:BASOPHILEN-DEGRANULATIONSTEST[2000/04]
English:BASOPHIL DEGRANULATION TEST[2000/04]
French:TEST DE DEGRANULATION DES BASOPHILES[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase16.03.1999National basic fee paid 
16.03.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
16.03.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.03.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
24.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2002Fee for grant paid
19.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]WO8404109  (BIO INSTRUCTA LABKONSULT [SE]);
 [A]WO9325904  (NUTRON LIMITED, et al);
 [A]WO9515494  (NUTRON LIMITED [GB], et al);
 [A]EP0185335  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]);
 [A]FR2467401  (WECK ALAIN DE [CH]);
 [A]EP0022698  (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.