EP0954398 - SAND CORE REMOVAL AND CASTING HEAT TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROCEDYNE CORPORATION 11 Industrial Drive New Brunswick NJ 08901 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states PROCEDYNE CORPORATION 11 Industrial Drive New Brunswick, NJ 08901 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BICKFORD, Karin, Staffin 172 Sayre Drive Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 02 /
STAFFIN, Herbert, Kenneth 36 Avalon Drive Colonia, NJ 07067 / US | 03 /
ROAPER, Robert, Bernard, II 350 Oak Hill Road Barrington Illinois 60010 / US | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Lomas, Geoffrey Michael, et al Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | Lomas, Geoffrey Michael, et al Barker Brettell Medina Chambers, Town Quay Southampton SO14 7AQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97901226.7 | 06.01.1997 | [1999/45] | WO1997IB00103 | Priority number, date | US19960724542 | 30.09.1996 Original published format: US 724542 | [1999/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9814291 | Date: | 09.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0954398 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0954398 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B22D29/00, C21D1/53, C21D9/00 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
C22F1/04 (EP,US);
B22D29/003 (EP,US);
C21D1/53 (EP,US);
C21D9/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [2005/20] |
Former [1999/45] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | SANDKERNENTFERNUNG UND WÄRMEBEHANDLUNG EINES GUSSSTÜCKES | [1999/45] | English: | SAND CORE REMOVAL AND CASTING HEAT TREATMENT | [1999/45] | French: | PROCEDE D'ELIMINATION DE NOYAU EN SABLE ET TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE DE PIECES COULEES | [1999/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.1999 | Search fee paid | 30.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 29.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.06.2005 | BE | 01.06.2005 | FI | 01.06.2005 | IT | 01.06.2005 | NL | 01.06.2005 | DK | 01.09.2005 | SE | 01.09.2005 | ES | 12.09.2005 | PT | 03.11.2005 | IE | 06.01.2006 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/49] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
IE | 06.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 01.06.2005 | |
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 01.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]FR2448573 (PHYSIQUE APPLIQUEE IND); | [A]JPS63108941 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD); | [Y]US5294094 (CRAFTON PAUL M [US], et al); | [A]US5332139 (HEATH JAMES E [US], et al); | [Y]US5423370 (BONNEMASOU RONALD [BR], et al) |