blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0883652

EP0883652 - RADIATION CURABLE COATING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.02.2001 [2001/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
[N/P]
Former [1998/51]For all designated states
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / JANSEN, Johan, Franz, Gradus, Antonius
Marisstraat 11
NL-6165 AP Geleen / NL
[1998/51]
Application number, filing date97901268.920.01.1997
[1998/51]
WO1997NL00017
Priority number, dateEP1996020052629.02.1996         Original published format: EP 96200526
[1998/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9731981
Date:04.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0883652
Date:16.12.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0883652
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.09.1997
ClassificationIPC:C09D4/00, C09D4/06, C08F283/01, C08F2/48, C09D167/06
[1998/51]
CPC:
C09D4/00 (EP); C08F283/01 (EP); C09D167/06 (EP)
C-Set:
C09D167/06, C08L2666/28 (EP);
C09D4/00, C08F216/00 (EP);
C09D4/00, C08F222/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1998/51]
TitleGerman:STRAHLUNGSHÄRTBARE BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG[1998/51]
English:RADIATION CURABLE COATING COMPOSITION[1998/51]
French:COMPOSITION DE REVETEMENT DURCISSABLE PAR RAYONNEMENT[1998/51]
Entry into regional phase25.08.1998National basic fee paid 
25.08.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
25.08.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.08.1998Examination requested  [1998/51]
12.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.1999Fee for grant paid
13.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH05320491  ;
 [A]WO9214764  (ISP INVESTMENTS) [A] 1-3,6-8,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0322808  (PPG INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-3,6-8,11 * page 4, line 32 - line 53 *;
 [A]WO9601283  (PPG INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-11;
 [DA]EP0618237  (FUSION SYSTEMS CORPORATION) [DA] 1-11;
 [A]WO9202572  (DSM) [A] 1-11
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940310), vol. 018, no. 145, Database accession no. (C - 1178), & JP05320491 A 19931203 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEM INC) [X] 1-3,6-10 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.