EP0883363 - SUPPORT PLATE FOR EXHIBITING OF GOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fehlbaum & Co. Klünenfeldstrasse 20 4132 Muttenz / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states Fehlbaum & Co. Klünenfeldstrasse 20 CH-4132 Muttenz / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALTER, Herbert Im Zehntgarten 13 D-79379 Müllheim / DE | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Heinen, Detlef, et al Bohest AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Heinen, Detlef, et al BOHEST AG Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2000/34] | Heinen, Detlef, et al c/o A.Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1998/51] | Ullrich, Gerhard, Dr., et al A. Braun, Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 97901507.0 | 07.02.1997 | [1998/51] | WO1997CH00038 | Priority number, date | DE1996203221U | 22.02.1996 Original published format: DE 29603221 U | [1998/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9730615 | Date: | 28.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0883363 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0883363 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A47F5/10, B62B3/02, F16B9/02 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
A47F5/108 (EP);
F16B9/05 (EP,US);
B62B3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1998/51] | Title | German: | STÄNDERPLATTE ZUR WARENPRÄSENTATION | [1998/51] | English: | SUPPORT PLATE FOR EXHIBITING OF GOODS | [1998/51] | French: | PLAQUE A MONTANTS POUR PRESENTATION D'ARTICLES | [1998/51] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 16.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 07.02.2000 | [2007/29] | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1293293 (M. ROGER LEVY) [A] 1-7; | [A]US3730109 (KREIZEL W, et al) [A] 1-7; | [A]DE3821049 (PERG CLAUDE [DE])[A] 1-7; | [A]US4989519 (WELSCH JOHN H [US], et al) [A] 1-7; | [A]EP0667307 (LAGAB AB [SE]) [A] 1-7 |