EP0956563 - METHOD FOR TREATING HAZARDOUS WASTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALTION TEKNILLINEN TUTKIMUSKESKUS Vuorimiehentie 5 02150 Espoo 15 / FI | [1999/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENBERG, Rolf VTT/Kemiantekniikka, Otakaari 3 A FIN-02150 Espoo / FI | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Papula, Antti, et al Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | Papula, Antti, et al Papula Rein Lahtela Oy, P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 97901636.7 | 23.01.1997 | [1999/46] | WO1997FI00033 | Priority number, date | FI19960000317 | 23.01.1996 Original published format: FI 960317 | [1999/46] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9727597 | Date: | 31.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956563 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0956563 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 31.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G21F9/30, G21G1/12 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
G21G1/12 (EP,US);
G21F9/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/46] | G21F9/00, A62D3/00, // B09B3/00, G21F9/30 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL, SE [1999/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GEFÄHRLICHEN ABFALLSTOFFEN | [1999/46] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING HAZARDOUS WASTE | [1999/46] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE DECHETS DANGEREUX | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.1997 | Translation filed | 25.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 25.06.1998 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 27.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 10.04.2002 | SE | 10.07.2002 | ES | 30.10.2002 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/09] | NL | 10.04.2002 | |
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 10.07.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8910162 (JAPAN DEV & CONSTRUCTION [US]); | [Y]JP59046899 ; | [Y]US5028452 (BEATTY CHARLES L [US]); | [A]US5134946 (POOVEY GARY N [US]); | [A]DE4113440 (JEROMIN GUENTER E PROF DR RER [DE]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN; & JP,A,59 046 899 (EBARA MFG CO LTD), 16 March 1984., & JP59046899 A 19840316 |