EP0876712 - A METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR MINIMIZING SKEW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1998/46] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON (publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDSTRÖM, Bengt Sävsangarvägen 49 S-138 37 Älta / SE | 02 /
MOLL, Hans-Christer Sagverksgatan 77 S-122 41 Enskede / SE | 03 /
STEIJER, Odd Tackjärnsvägen 14 S-161 31 Bromma / SE | [1998/46] | Representative(s) | Hedberg, Sten Torsten, et al Ericsson Components AB, Department for IPR, Kista 164 81 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | Hedberg, Sten Torsten, et al Ericsson Components AB, Department for IPR, Kista 164 81 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 97901865.2 | 17.01.1997 | [1998/46] | WO1997SE00070 | Priority number, date | SE19960000293 | 26.01.1996 Original published format: SE 9600293 | [1998/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9727679 | Date: | 31.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0876712 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 31.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/74, H04L1/22 | [1998/46] | CPC: |
H04L1/02 (EP,US);
H04B1/74 (KR);
H04L1/22 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR MINIMIERUNG DER VERSCHIEBUNG | [1998/46] | English: | A METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR MINIMIZING SKEW | [1998/46] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DESTINES A MINIMISER L'ASYMETRIE | [1998/46] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 13.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/46] | 19.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/21] | 12.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4879433 (GILLETT JOHN B [US], et al); | [A]US4392199 (SCHMITTER ERNST [DE], et al) |