EP0958159 - A CARRIER FOR VEHICLE ROOFS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraser, Bradley Stewart 2 St Tropez Terrace Xorrento QLD 4217 / AU | [2005/37] |
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states Fraser, Bradley Stewart 108 Salerno Street Isle of Capri QLD 4217 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Patrick, Yelverton 40 Martinique Way Clear Island Waters, QLD 4226 / AU | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [1999/47] | Rickard, Timothy Mark Adrian, et al Brookes & Martin, High Holborn House, 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 97902095.5 | 06.02.1997 | [1999/47] | WO1997AU00061 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9834813 | Date: | 13.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0958159 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0958159 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 13.08.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60R9/04, B60R9/045, B60R9/052, B60R9/058 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
B60R9/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/47] | Extension states | AL | 26.05.1998 | LT | 26.05.1998 | LV | 26.05.1998 | RO | 26.05.1998 | SI | 26.05.1998 | Title | German: | GEPÄCKTRÄGER FÜR FAHRZEUGE | [1999/47] | English: | A CARRIER FOR VEHICLE ROOFS | [1999/47] | French: | FIXE-AU-TOIT | [1999/47] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.1998 | Search fee paid | 26.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 13.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 13.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 28.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42] | Request for further processing for: | 28.06.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 28.06.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.07.2004 | Decision despatched | 20.12.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.2000 | 28.02.2003 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2003 | 29.02.2004 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.10.2004 | BE | 27.10.2004 | FI | 27.10.2004 | NL | 27.10.2004 | DK | 27.01.2005 | SE | 27.01.2005 | DE | 28.01.2005 | LU | 06.02.2005 | IE | 07.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | PT | 27.03.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
SE | 27.01.2005 | ||
DE | 28.01.2005 | ||
LU | 06.02.2005 | ||
IE | 07.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/24] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
DE | 28.01.2005 | ||
IE | 07.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
DE | 28.01.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
DE | 28.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 27.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR766722 (PEROT); | [A]FR45694E (PEROT) [A] 1,2,6,7,11-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US3884404 (FROST GRANGER H); | [A]US4101062 (LAZAR BENJAMIN E); | [E]AU676985B (YELVERTON HOLDINGS PTY LTD) [E] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [E]WO9749574 (DERRIMAN LINDSAY ERNEST [AU]) [E] 1,2,4-7,9,10,12-14 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2409946 (MACLEOD DOUGLAS W); | [A]GB762177 (CHARLES BALDWIN MILLETT); | [A]GB920588 (AVON INDIA RUBBER CO LTD); | [X]US4117963 (LUCZYNSKI KAZIMIERZ); | [A]WO8404074 (CHICK WARREN NEIL) | by applicant | AU493424B | US2409946 |