EP0874729 - DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF SINGLE-FACED CORRUGATED CARDBOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stone Europa Carton Aktiengesellschaft Spitalerstrasse 11 20095 Hamburg / DE | [1998/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMCKE, Timm Doktorberg 21 D-21029 Hamburg / DE | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff Grubesallee 26 22143 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97902177.1 | 16.01.1997 | [1998/45] | WO1997EP00207 | Priority number, date | DE1996103015 | 17.01.1996 Original published format: DE 19603015 | [1998/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9726132 | Date: | 24.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0874729 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B31F1/28 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
B31F1/2863 (EP);
B31F1/2877 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/45] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINSEITIGER WELLPAPPE | [1998/45] | English: | DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF SINGLE-FACED CORRUGATED CARDBOARD | [1998/45] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR FABRIQUER DU CARTON ONDULE SIMPLE FACE | [1998/45] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 24.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR2142591 (ROQUETTE FRERES) [X] 1,7,8,14-16 * page 5, line 28 - line 39; figure 3 * [Y] 5,6; | [Y]EP0623459 (INTERFIC DEV INC) [Y] 5,6 * abstract *; | [X]EP0687553 (BHS CORRUGATED MASCHINEN UND A) [X] 1,7,8,14-16 * claim 7 *; | [DA]WO9503166 (OTOR SA ;BARNY JEAN JACQUES (FR); PAULTES JEAN MARIE (FR)) [DA] 1,14; | [A]EP0492310 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1,14; | [A]DE2527819 (BHS BAYERISCHE BERG) [A] 1,14; | [A]EP0104372 (PETERS MASCHF WERNER H K) [A] 1,14 |