EP0874645 - PERFLUOROALKYL-CONTAINING METAL COMPLEXES AND THEIR USE IN NMR DIAGNOSTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 170/178 13353 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Müllerstrasse 170/178 13353 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLATZEK, Johannes Grottkauer Strasse 55 D-12621 Berlin / DE | 02 /
NIEDBALLA, Ulrich Gosslerstrasse 28a D-14195 Berlin / DE | 03 /
RADÜCHEL, Bernd Gollanczstrasse 132 D-13465 Berlin / DE | 04 /
SCHLECKER, Wolfgang Friedelstrasse 15 D-12047 Berlin / DE | 05 /
WEINMANN, Hanns-Joachim Westhofener Weg 23 D-14129 Berlin / DE | 06 /
FRENZEL, Thomas Paul-Schneider-Strasse 41 D-12247 Berlin / DE | 07 /
MISSELWITZ, Bernd Markendorfer Strasse 5 D-13439 Berlin / DE | 08 /
EBERT, Wolfgang Hortensienstrasse 64 D-12203 Berlin / DE | [1998/45] | Application number, filing date | 97902179.7 | 16.01.1997 | [1998/45] | WO1997EP00209 | Priority number, date | DE1996103033 | 19.01.1996 Original published format: DE 19603033 | [1998/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9726017 | Date: | 24.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0874645 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0874645 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/00 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
C07D295/26 (EP,US);
A61K49/00 (KR);
A61K49/0002 (EP,US);
A61K49/0004 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
B65D25/16 (EP,US);
B65D47/0847 (EP,US);
B65D83/0055 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/45] | Extension states | LT | 20.05.1998 | LV | 20.05.1998 | RO | 20.05.1998 | Title | German: | PERFLUORALKYLHALTIGE METALLKOMPLEXE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN DER NMR-DIAGNOSTIK | [1998/45] | English: | PERFLUOROALKYL-CONTAINING METAL COMPLEXES AND THEIR USE IN NMR DIAGNOSTICS | [1998/45] | French: | COMPLEXES METALLIQUES CONTENANT DU PERFLUOROALKYLE ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LE DIAGNOSTIC PAR RMN | [1998/45] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 09.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5248498 (NEUMANN WILLIAM L [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * examples 2,4 ** claims 4-8,13-17 *; | [XY]EP0592306 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [XY] 1-17 * abstract * * example - *; | [XY]EP0628316 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [XY] 1-17 * abstract * * example - *; | [X]US5401493 (LOHRMANN ROLF [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * figure 4 * * example 4 *; | [X] - LEE H ET AL, "In vivo fluorine-19 MR imaging: relaxation enhancement with Gd-DTPA.", J MAGN RESON IMAGING, JUL-AUG 1994, VOL. 4, NO. 4, PAGE(S) 609-13, XP002041354 [X] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [RESULTS] * * siehe Absatz DISCUSSION * | [X] - THOMAS SR ET AL, "Evaluation of the influence of the aqueous phase bioconstituent environment on the F-19 T1 of perfluorocarbon blood substitute emulsions.", J MAGN RESON IMAGING, JUL-AUG 1994, VOL. 4, NO. 4, PAGE(S) 631-5, XP002041355 [X] 1-17 * abstract * * siehe Absatz CONCLUSION * | [X] - GONG B ET AL, "PARAMETER OPTIMIZATION AND CALIBRATION OF FLUORINE-19 MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING AT 1.5 TESLA", MAGN RESON IMAGING, 1991, VOL. 9, NO. 1, PAGE(S) 101-106., XP002041356 [X] 1-17 * abstract * * siehe Absatz SIGNAL VERSUS CONCENTRATION OF GADOLINIUM;; figures 4,5 * * page 104, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0730-725X(91)90103-S | [Y] - RATNER A V ET AL, "FLUORINE-19 RELAXATION RATE ENHANCEMENT AND FREQUENCY SHIFT WITH GADOLINIUM-DTPA", INVEST RADIOL, 1989, VOL. 24, NO. 3, PAGE(S) 224-227., XP002041357 [Y] 1-17 * siehe Titel; paragraph [RESULTS] * * siehe Absatz DISCUSSION * |