blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0821035

EP0821035 - THERMOPLASTIC ELASTOMER COMPOSITION, PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF, HOSE MADE BY USING THE COMPOSITION, AND PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.10.2005  [2005/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD.
36-11, Shinbashi 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo, 105-0004 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/43]For all designated states
THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD.
36-11, Shinbashi 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo, 105-0004 / JP
Former [1998/05]For all designated states
THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD.
36-11, Shinbashi 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo, 105 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KAWAZURA, Tetsuji
The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd., 2-1, Oiwake
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254 / JP
02 / OZAWA, Osamu
The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd., 2-1, Oiwake
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254 / JP
03 / SOEDA, Yoshihiro
The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd., 2-1, Oiwake
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254 / JP
04 / TANAKA, Katuhiro
The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd., 2--1, Oiwake
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254 / JP
05 / SATOH, Takashi
The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd., 2-1, Oiwake
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254 / JP
06 / YAMAUCHI, Shigeru
The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd., 2-1, Oiwake
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254 / JP
07 / KAWAMORI, Yuji
The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd., 2-1, Oiwake
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254 / JP
08 / MARUYAMA, Toshio
1, Hatorinishi, Minorimachi
Higashiibaraki-gun, Ibaraki 319-01 / JP
09 / KURODA, Noriaki
The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd., 2-1, Oiwake
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254 / JP
10 / TAKAHASHI, Shuji
The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd., 2-1, Oiwake
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254 / JP
11 / IRII, Daisuke
The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd., 2-1, Oiwake
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254 / JP
12 / ISHIKAWA, Kazunori
The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd., 2-1, Oiwake
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254 / JP
13 / HATANAKA, Susumu
The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd., 2-1, Oiwake
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254 / JP
[1998/05]
Representative(s)Hansen, Bernd, et al
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/05]Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date97902629.107.02.1997
[1998/05]
WO1997JP00329
Priority number, dateJP1996002390309.02.1996         Original published format: JP 2390396
JP1996002654214.02.1996         Original published format: JP 2654296
JP1996021276012.08.1996         Original published format: JP 21276096
JP1996024760519.09.1996         Original published format: JP 24760596
JP1996028439325.10.1996         Original published format: JP 28439396
JP1996028849630.10.1996         Original published format: JP 28849696
JP1996029036031.10.1996         Original published format: JP 29036096
JP1996029175101.11.1996         Original published format: JP 29175196
JP1996029207301.11.1996         Original published format: JP 29207396
JP1997002362006.02.1997         Original published format: JP 2362097
[1998/05]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9729153
Date:14.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0821035
Date:28.01.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0821035
Date:20.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.08.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:C08L67/02, C08L33/04, B29D23/00, B29C47/02, C08L67/00, B32B1/08, B32B25/10, F16L11/08, // (B29K33/00, 67:00, B29L23:00)
[2000/06]
CPC:
B32B25/10 (EP,US); C08L67/02 (EP,KR,US); B29C48/15 (KR);
B29C48/151 (EP,US); B29C48/153 (EP,US); B29C70/086 (EP,US);
B29C70/088 (EP,US); B29C70/222 (EP,US); B29D23/00 (KR);
B32B1/08 (EP,US); B32B7/12 (US); C08L33/14 (KR);
C08L67/00 (EP,US); C08L67/025 (EP,US); F16L11/085 (EP,US);
F16L11/086 (EP,US); B29C48/0021 (EP,US); B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/185 (EP,US); B29C48/21 (EP,US); B29C53/58 (EP,US);
B29K2021/00 (EP,US); B29K2101/12 (EP,US); B29K2105/0827 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0072 (EP,US); B29L2009/00 (EP,US); B29L2023/005 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0276 (US); B32B2305/72 (US); B32B2597/00 (US);
C08L13/00 (EP,US); C08L23/02 (EP,US); C08L23/08 (EP,US);
C08L33/06 (EP,US); C08L33/08 (EP,US); C08L67/04 (EP,US);
C08L83/00 (EP,US); C08L83/04 (EP,US); Y10T428/31913 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C08L67/00, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L67/00, C08L33/00 (EP,US);
C08L67/025, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L67/025, C08L2666/08 (US,EP)
Former IPC [1998/05]C08L67/02, C08L33/04, B29D23/00, B29C47/02, // (B29K33/00, 67:00, B29L23:00)
Designated contracting statesDE,   IT [1998/05]
TitleGerman:THERMOPLASTISCHE ELASTOMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG, SCHLAUCH AUS DIESER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG[1998/05]
English:THERMOPLASTIC ELASTOMER COMPOSITION, PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF, HOSE MADE BY USING THE COMPOSITION, AND PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF[1998/05]
French:COMPOSITION THERMOPLASTIQUE ELASTOMERE, PROCEDE POUR SA FABRICATION, TUYAU REALISE AVEC CETTE COMPOSITION ET PROCEDE POUR LE FABRIQUER[1998/05]
Entry into regional phase09.10.1997Translation filed 
09.10.1997National basic fee paid 
09.10.1997Search fee paid 
09.10.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.1997Examination requested  [1998/05]
05.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.08.2004Fee for grant paid
17.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
16.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
16.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
24.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]JPS5597948  (MEIJI GOMU KASEI KK);
 [A]JPS59147184  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO);
 [Y]JPS61153088  (NITTA MOORE CO LTD);
 [Y]JPS62171582  (NITTA MOORE CO LTD);
 [X]JPS63251233  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND);
 [X]JPH03146328  (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD);
 [X]JPH0525374  (NIPPON ZEON CO, et al);
 [X]JPH0664102  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.