blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0913186

EP0913186 - HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  31.03.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2010Change - representativepublished on 14.04.2010  [2010/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASAHI MEDICAL Co., Ltd.
9-1, Kanda Mitoyo-cho, Ciyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/44]
Former [1999/18]For all designated states
Asahi Kasei Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8205 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / FUKUDA, Makoto
1-85-1-202, Hirabaru-cho, Nobeoka-shi
Miyazaki 882 / JP
02 / MIYAZAKI, Makato
2-4-12-106, Midorigaoka, Nobeoka-shi
Miyazaki 882 / JP
[1999/18]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [1999/18]von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al
Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus)
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date97902630.907.02.1997
[1999/18]
WO1997JP00330
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9834719
Date:13.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0913186
Date:06.05.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.08.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2000
ClassificationIPC:B01D69/08, B01D71/10, D01D5/24, D01F2/04
[1999/18]
CPC:
D01F2/04 (EP); B01D67/00165 (EP,US); B01D69/02 (EP);
B01D69/08 (EP); B01D69/085 (EP); B01D71/10 (EP);
D01D5/24 (EP); B01D2323/06 (EP); B01D2325/0232 (EP,US);
B01D2325/20 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1999/18]
TitleGerman:HOHLFASERMEMBRAN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[1999/18]
English:HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME[1999/18]
French:MEMBRANE A FIBRES CREUSES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[1999/18]
Entry into regional phase06.10.1998Translation filed 
06.10.1998National basic fee paid 
06.10.1998Search fee paid 
06.10.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
06.10.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.10.1998Examination requested  [1999/18]
05.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2005Date of oral proceedings
06.12.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/20]
06.12.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
16.12.2005Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
24.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US5480552  (SOLTYS PAUL [US], et al)
International search[A]JPS53106769  (JAPAN EXLAN CO LTD);
 [Y]JPS54145379  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND);
 [A]JPS5735905  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND);
 [A]JPS59160507  (KURARAY CO);
 [Y]JPS59204911  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND);
 [Y]JPS6045358  (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.