EP0883704 - COUPLING DEVICE FOR TEXTILE MACHINES AND DOBBY WITH COUPLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kleiner, Ernst Heubachstrasse 46 8810 Horgen / CH | For all designated states Rohner, Felix Sägestrasse 5 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [1998/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Heubeck, Bernhard Sulzer Management AG KS Patente/0007 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Heubeck, Bernhard Sulzer Management AG, KS Patente/0007, Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
Former [1998/51] | Heubeck, Bernhard Sulzer Management AG, KS Patente/0007, Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 97903191.1 | 28.02.1997 | [1998/51] | WO1997CH00073 | Priority number, date | CH19960000507 | 28.02.1996 Original published format: CH 50796 | [1998/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9732066 | Date: | 04.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0883704 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D03C1/00, F16D11/16 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
D03C1/00 (EP);
F16D11/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT [1998/51] | Title | German: | KUPPLUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR TEXTILMASCHINEN UND SCHAFTMASCHINE MIT KUPPLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1998/51] | English: | COUPLING DEVICE FOR TEXTILE MACHINES AND DOBBY WITH COUPLING DEVICE | [1998/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ACCOUPLEMENT POUR MACHINES TEXTILES ET RATIERE D'ARMURES MUNIE DE CE DISPOSITIF D'ACCOUPLEMENT | [1998/51] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 22.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/03] | 26.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0525862 (NUOVO PIGNONE SPA) [Y] 1-4,7,8 * column 8, line 7 - column 9, line 31; figures 4-6 *; | [Y]JPH0827642 ; | [Y]EP0675218 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS) [Y] 3 * column 7, line 26 - line 35; figure - *; | [A]EP0234321 (FIMTESSILE) [A] 1,3 * column 5, line 34 - column 6, line 6; figures 9,10 *; | [A]EP0607632 (BURIGANA LUCIO) [A] 6 * figure - * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 096, no. 005, & JP08027642 A 19960130 (TOYOTA AUTOM LOOM WORKS LTD) [Y] 1,2,4,7,8 * abstract * |