EP0887791 - METHOD OF PROVIDING A PHASE-CHANGE OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM, AND A PHASE-CHANGE OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/01] | METHOD OF DESIGNING A PHASE-CHANGE OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM, AND A PHASE-CHANGE OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM | ||
[2005/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [2006/27] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8205 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Toshio Ken-Shokuin-Kohsha 302, 5-14, Sensyu-yadome-machi Akita-shi, Akita 010 / JP | 02 /
MORIMOTO, Isao Asahi Kasei Nishi Apartment 954, 100, Kawanarijima Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 416 / JP | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 97903626.6 | 28.02.1997 | [1999/01] | WO1997JP00596 | Priority number, date | JP19960041924 | 28.02.1996 Original published format: JP 4192496 | JP19960041925 | 28.02.1996 Original published format: JP 4192596 | JP19960318902 | 29.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31890296 | [1999/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9732304 | Date: | 04.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0887791 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0887791 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.09.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B7/00 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
G11B7/257 (EP,US);
G11B7/24 (EP,US);
G11B7/243 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24312 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24314 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24316 (EP,US);
G11B7/00454 (EP,US);
G11B7/006 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/01] | G11B7/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERFÜGUNG STELLEN EINES OPTISCHEN AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUMS VOM PHASENWECHSELTYP SOWIE OPTISCHES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM VOM PHASENWECHSELTYP | [2005/49] | English: | METHOD OF PROVIDING A PHASE-CHANGE OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM, AND A PHASE-CHANGE OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM | [2005/49] | French: | MILIEU D'ENREGISTREMENT OPTIQUE A CHANGEMENT DE PHASE ET PROCEDE POUR LE REALISER | [1999/01] |
Former [1999/01] | VERFAHREN ZUM ENTWURF EINES OPTISCHEN AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUMS VOM PHASENWECHSELTYP SOWIE OPTISCHES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM VOM PHASENWECHSELTYP | ||
Former [1999/01] | METHOD OF DESIGNING A PHASE-CHANGE OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM, AND A PHASE-CHANGE OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.1998 | Translation filed | 18.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.1998 | Search fee paid | 18.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 18.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/53] | 13.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2006 | BE | 05.07.2006 | FI | 05.07.2006 | IT | 05.07.2006 | DK | 05.10.2006 | SE | 05.10.2006 | GR | 06.10.2006 | ES | 16.10.2006 | PT | 05.12.2006 | IE | 28.02.2007 | LU | 28.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | [2010/05] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
IT | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
GR | 06.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
IT | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
IT | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 05.07.2006 | |
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/17] | FI | 05.07.2006 | |
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05159360 ; | [PA]JPH0896411 ; | [A]EP0630007 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9526550 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0706177 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [PA] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO9617344 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al) [PA] 1-6 * the whole document *; | US5652036 [ ] (KOBAYASHI TADASHI [JP]) [ ] * cited for language reasons *; | US5882758 [ ] (TERADA MASATO [JP], et al) [ ] * cited for language reasons * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931012), vol. 017, no. 563, Database accession no. (P - 1628), & JP05159360 A 19930625 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 096, no. 008, & JP08096411 A 19960412 (TOSHIBA CORP) [PA] 1-6 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH05298748 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |