EP0959656 - A DEVICE FOR PERIODIC DEPOSITING OF LIQUID MANURE SUCH AS SLURRY IN A SOIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/48] | A METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PERIODIC DEPOSITING OF LIQUID MANURE SUCH AS SLURRY IN A SOIL | ||
[2002/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HATLO, Jan Kare N-6052 Giske / NO | [1999/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97903675.3 | 14.02.1997 | [1999/48] | WO1997NO00049 | Priority number, date | NO19960000623 | 16.02.1996 Original published format: NO 960623 | [1999/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9729626 | Date: | 21.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0959656 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0959656 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A01C23/02, // A01C23/00 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
A01C23/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/48] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UM PERIODISCH FLÜSSIGMIST, SOWIE SCHWEMMMIST, IM BODEN UNTERZUBRINGEN | [2002/50] | English: | A DEVICE FOR PERIODIC DEPOSITING OF LIQUID MANURE SUCH AS SLURRY IN A SOIL | [2002/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LE DEPOT PERIODIQUE D'ENGRAIS LIQUIDE SOUS FORME DE BOUE DANS LA TERRRE | [2002/50] |
Former [1999/48] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG UM PERIODISCH FLÜSSIGMIST, SOWIE SCHWEMMMIST, IM BODEN UNTERZUBRINGEN | ||
Former [1999/48] | A METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PERIODIC DEPOSITING OF LIQUID MANURE SUCH AS SLURRY IN A SOIL | ||
Former [1999/48] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE DEPOT PERIODIQUE D'ENGRAIS LIQUIDE SOUS FORME DE BOUE DANS LA TERRRE | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 09.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 02.07.2003 | LI | 02.07.2003 | GR | 02.10.2003 | PT | 02.10.2003 | [2004/22] |
Former [2004/14] | GR | 02.10.2003 | |
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | PT | 02.10.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2988025 (DOUGLAS JOHNSTON); | [A]US3435785 (HARBOLT BRUCE A); | [A]US4624195 (DOERING CHARLES W [US]); | [X]US4907516 (ROGERS RAMON B [CA]); | [A]EP0430347 (VREDO DODEWAARD BV [NL]); | [A]NO169811B (HATLOE JAN KAARE) |