EP0882177 - FAN SHROUD AND RECEPTACLE ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McCORD WINN TEXTRON INC. 645 Harvey Road Manchester, NH 03103 / US | [1998/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLANT, William, D. 103 Cane Brake Drive Anderson, SC 29621 / US | [1998/50] | Representative(s) | Kierdorf, Theodor Patentanwalt Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | Kierdorf, Theodor Patentanwalt Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2002/42] | Patentanwälte Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner Postfach 30 02 08 51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [1998/50] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 97904051.6 | 29.01.1997 | [1998/50] | WO1997US01390 | Priority number, date | US19960605981 | 23.02.1996 Original published format: US 605981 | [1998/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9731182 | Date: | 28.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0882177 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0882177 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.08.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F01P9/04, F01P11/02, F01P5/06, F04D29/58 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
F04D29/545 (EP,US);
F01P11/029 (EP,US);
F01P5/06 (EP,US);
F28F9/002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/50] | F01P9/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/50] | Title | German: | VENTILATORGEHÄUSE | [1998/50] | English: | FAN SHROUD AND RECEPTACLE ARRANGEMENT | [1998/50] | French: | AMENAGEMENT DE LA BUSE ET DU RECEPTACLE DU VENTILATEUR | [1998/50] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.1998 | Search fee paid | 05.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/50] | 14.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 18.10.2006 | ES | 29.01.2007 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/21] | ES | 29.01.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5341871 (STELZER SEAN R [US]) [A] 1-3 * figure 1 * * abstract * * claims 1-8 *; | [A]EP0628596 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1,6,7 * abstract * * page 6, line 41 - line 47 * * page 6, line 49 - line 56 * | International search | [A]US3692004 (TANGUE DUANE R, et al); | [A]US3833054 (GROSS E, et al); | [A]US4030541 (GROSS ERWIN, et al); | [A]US4709757 (BLY TOM C [US]); | [A]US4762244 (ZIEGLER DAVID B [US]); | [A]US4763724 (TEMMESFELD AXEL [DE], et al); | [A]US4947931 (VITACCO RICHARD L [US]); | [A]US5012768 (ROSCHINSKI DIETER [DE]); | [A]US5107924 (HERBERT DAMSOHN [DE], et al) |