EP0879028 - VASCULAR PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/48] | VASCULAR PROSTHESIS ASSEMBLY | ||
[1998/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.2000 [2000/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Havel, Michael Linzerstrasse 54 1140 Wien / AT | For all designated states Ehrlich, Marek Rochusgasse 9/11 1030 Wien / AT | [1998/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/48] | Representative(s) | Haffner, Thomas M. Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte KG Schottengasse 3a 1014 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | Haffner, Thomas M., Dr. Patentanwalt Schottengasse 3a 1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 97904286.8 | 06.02.1997 | [1998/48] | WO1997AT00022 | Priority number, date | AT19960000218 | 06.02.1996 Original published format: AT 21896 | [1998/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9728758 | Date: | 14.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0879028 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0879028 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [1998/48] | CPC: |
A61F2/95 (EP);
A61F2/06 (EP);
A61F2/0095 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/48] | Title | German: | GEFÄSSPROTHESE | [1998/48] | English: | VASCULAR PROSTHESIS | [1998/52] | French: | PROTHESE VASCULAIRE | [1998/52] |
Former [1998/48] | VASCULAR PROSTHESIS ASSEMBLY | ||
Former [1998/48] | ENSEMBLE PROTHESE VASCULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 05.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0364420 (MEDINVENT SA [CH]) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]US5078720 (BURTON JOHN H [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 5 - line 41; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0472731 (INOUE KANJI [JP]) [Y] 1 * column 8, line 7 - line 56; figures 7-11 *; | [A]EP0539237 (COOK INC [US]); | [Y]US5415664 (PINCHUK LEONARD [US]) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 4 - line 48; figure 5 * |