EP0934499 - SIGHTING DEVICE FOR SMALL ARMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEYR-DAIMLER-PUCH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Franz-Josefs-Kai 51 1010 Wien / AT | [1999/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUBITS, Wilhelm Franz-Anderle-Platz 4/4/6 A-2345 Brunn/Gebirge / AT | [1999/32] | Representative(s) | Kovac, Werner MAGNA EUROPA AG Patentabteilung Magna-Strasse 1 2522 Oberwaltersdorf / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Kovac, Werner MAGNA EUROPA AG Patentabteilung Magna-Strasse 1 2522 Oberwaltersdorf / AT | ||
Former [2000/33] | Kovac, Werner c/o Magna Europa AG, Patentabteilung, 2. Haidequerstrasse 3 1111 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 97904918.6 | 25.02.1997 | [1999/32] | WO1997AT00033 | Priority number, date | AT19960000345 | 26.02.1996 Original published format: AT 34596 | AT19960001360 | 30.07.1996 Original published format: AT 136096 | [1999/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9732176 | Date: | 04.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0934499 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0934499 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F41G1/01 | [1999/32] | CPC: |
F41G1/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [1999/32] | Title | German: | VISIEREINRICHTUNG FÜR HANDFEUERWAFFEN | [1999/32] | English: | SIGHTING DEVICE FOR SMALL ARMS | [1999/32] | French: | APPAREIL DE VISEE POUR ARME DE POING | [1999/32] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.08.1998 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 01.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.11.1998 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   13.11.1998 | 05.11.1998 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   13.11.1998 | 05.11.1998 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   13.11.1998 | 05.11.1998 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   13.11.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR342645 (OTTO GERGACSEVICS [AT]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 74 - line 88; figures 4,5 * [Y] 2-6; | [Y]US3192632 (VON STAVENHAGEN GEORG) [Y] 2,3 * column 4, line 50 - column 6, line 2; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]US1363553 (MOREAU BARRINGER DANIEL) [Y] 4,6 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 97; figure - *; | [Y]FR332634 (ALEXANDER DE CHYLINSKI [HU]) [Y] 5,6 * figure 4 *; | [X]DE453656 (ROBERT DEHNHARDT, et al) [X] 1 * page 1; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE397127 (HERMANN SEEVERS) [X] 1 * page 2, line 3 - line 34; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US1358015 (JOHAN PEN KLAAS) [A] 2,4 * page 1, line 49 - page 2, line 2; figure - *; | [AD]DE2126068 (HEIDEN) [AD] 1; | [AD]AT379447B (GLOCK GASTON [AT]) [AD] 2-4 |