EP0891378 - USE OF A PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING AN APPETITE-SUPPRESSING PEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THIM, Lars Skiftevej 22 DK-2820 Gentofte / DK | 02 /
WULFF, Birgitte, Schjellerup Parkvej 28 DK-2830 Virum / DK | 03 /
JUDGE, Martin, Edward Vendersgade 22, 4.tv DK-1363 Kobenhavn K / DK | 04 /
MADSEN, Ole, Dragsbak Kildebakkegards Allé 48A DK-2860 Soborg / DK | 05 /
HOLST, Jens, Juul Ellemosevej 47B DK-2900 Hellerup / DK | [1999/03] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Philip John Duval, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | Thomas, Philip John Duval, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2000/04] | Stephensen, Birgitte Borregaard, et al Novo Nordisk A/S, Health Care Patents, Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
Former [1999/11] | Stephensen, Birgitte Borregaard (DK), et al c/o Novo Nordisk A/S Corporate Patents Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
Former [1999/03] | Stephensen, Birgitte Borregaard, et al c/o Chas. Hude, 33, H.C. Andersens Boulevard 1553 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 97905000.2 | 27.02.1997 | [1999/03] | WO1997DK00086 | Priority number, date | DK19960000230 | 01.03.1996 Original published format: DK 23096 | DK19960000231 | 01.03.1996 Original published format: DK 23196 | [1999/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9731943 | Date: | 04.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0891378 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0891378 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/605, A61K38/26 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
C07K14/605 (EP,KR);
A61K38/26 (KR);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/03] | Extension states | AL | 01.10.1998 | LT | 01.10.1998 | LV | 01.10.1998 | RO | 01.10.1998 | SI | 01.10.1998 | Title | German: | Gebrauch einer pharmazeutischen Zusammensetzung, enthaltend ein appetitzügelndes Peptid | [2001/18] | English: | USE OF A PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING AN APPETITE-SUPPRESSING PEPTIDE | [1999/03] | French: | UTILISATION D'UNE COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE CONTENANT UN PEPTIDE VISANT A REDUIRE L'APPETIT | [1999/03] |
Former [1999/03] | Gebrauch einer pharmazeutischen Zusammensetzung, enthaltend ein appetitzügelndesPeptid | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/03] | 05.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP01122701.4 / EP1231218 | EP08103786.3 / EP1975177 | EP10180925.9 / EP2295453 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2003
23.06.2006
WITHDRAWN Chapman, Paul G., Dr. Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2003
23.06.2006
WITHDRAWN Chapman, Paul G., Dr. Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [2003/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2003
WITHDRAWN Chapman, Dr.Paul G. Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | 30.09.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.07.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.06.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.08.2006 | 26.06.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 10.07.2006 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2006/46] | 02.08.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 13.11.2002 | PT | 13.02.2003 | [2003/31] |
Former [2003/29] | PT | 13.02.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9318786 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al); | [XP]WO9632414 (ONTARIO INC 1149336 [CA]) | [A] - NATURE, Volume 379, January 1996, M.D. TURTON et al., "A Role for Glucagon-Like Peptide-1 in the Central Regulation of Feeding", page 69. | [A] - DIABETIC MEDICINE, Volume 12, 1995, J. RACHMAN et al., "Drugs on the Horizon for Treatment of Type 2 Diabetes", pages 467-478. |