Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001502445 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9700276 | 13.02.1997 | FR9601872 | 15.02.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1883697 | Global Dossier | 02.09.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9700276 | 13.02.1997 | FR9601872 | 15.02.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0880759 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2005 | B1 | EP0880759 | 02.12.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9700276 | 13.02.1997 | FR9601872 | 15.02.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69734506T | 10.08.2006 | T2 | DE69734506D1 | 08.12.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9700276 | 13.02.1997 | FR9601872 | 15.02.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6393567 | 21.05.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | FR9700276 | 13.02.1997 | FR9601872 | 15.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9730424 | Global Dossier | 21.08.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9601872 | 15.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2246301 | 21.08.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9601872 | 15.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2745135 | 18.09.1998 | B1 | FR2745135 | 22.08.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9601872 | 15.02.1996 |