EP0880759 - METHOD FOR SERVER-AUTHORISED SERVICE ACCESS FROM PORTABLE ELECTRONIC MICROCIRCUIT DEVICES SUCH AS SMART CARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELVA SA 72-74, avenue Edouard Vaillant 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | For all designated states ELVA SA 72-74, avenu Edouard Vaillant 92100 Boulogne / FR | ||
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states ELVA 72-74, avenue Edouard Vaillant 92100 Boulogne / FR | ||
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states Misko, Patrick 538, avenue de l'Hautil 78955 Carrières-sous-Poissy / FR | ||
For all designated states Colnot, Cédric 17, rue Jean-Jacques-Rousseau 94200 Ivry-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLNOT, Cédric 17, rue Jean-Jacques-Rousseau F-94200 Ivry-sur-Seine / FR | [1998/49] | Representative(s) | Doireau, Marc, et al Cabinet ORES, 36,rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | Doireau, Marc, et al Cabinet Orès 6, avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97905199.2 | 13.02.1997 | [1998/49] | WO1997FR00276 | Priority number, date | FR19960001872 | 15.02.1996 Original published format: FR 9601872 | [1998/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9730424 | Date: | 21.08.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0880759 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0880759 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10, G07C9/00, E05B49/00 | [1998/49] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4097 (EP,US);
G07C9/215 (EP,US);
G07C2009/0023 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00253 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/39] |
Former [1998/49] | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UM DEN ZUGANG ZU EINER DIENSTLEISTUNG MIT HILFE TRAGBARER VORRICHTUNGEN MIT ELEKTRONISCHEN SCHALTKREISEN Z.B. SPEICHERKARTEN DURCH EINEN SERVER AUTORISIEREN ZU LASSEN | [1998/49] | English: | METHOD FOR SERVER-AUTHORISED SERVICE ACCESS FROM PORTABLE ELECTRONIC MICROCIRCUIT DEVICES SUCH AS SMART CARDS | [1998/49] | French: | PROCEDE POUR FAIRE AUTORISER PAR UN SERVEUR L'ACCES A UN SERVICE A PARTIR DE DISPOSITIFS PORTATIFS A MICROCIRCUITS ELECTRONIQUES DU TYPE CARTE A MEMOIRE PAR EXEMPLE | [1998/49] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 01.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41] | Request for further processing for: | 21.06.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 21.06.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.07.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.2004 | 28.02.2005 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.11.2005 | NL | 02.11.2005 | ES | 13.02.2006 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/50] | NL | 02.11.2005 | |
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/24] | NL | 02.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0219060 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [YA]EP0265728 (RUF KG WILHELM [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * [A] ; | [A]EP0372285 (DELTA ELETTRONICA SPA [IT]); | [YA]EP0385070 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4,5,7; | [A]EP0459781 (NANOTEQ PTY LTD [ZA]) [A] 1-5,7,10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0605996 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al); | [A]DE4411450 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) |