EP0958583 - SURGE ARRESTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB AB 721 83 Västerås / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states ABB AB 721 83 Västeras / SE | ||
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AB 721 83 Västeras / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDBERG, Björn Engelbrektsgatan 22b S-771 30 Ludvika / SE | [1999/47] | Application number, filing date | 97905518.3 | 29.01.1997 | [1999/47] | WO1997SE00140 | Priority number, date | SE19960000641 | 21.02.1996 Original published format: SE 9600641 | [1999/47] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9731380 | Date: | 28.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0958583 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0958583 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01C7/12 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
H01C7/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, GR, IT [1999/47] | Title | German: | ÜBERSPANNUNGSABLEITER | [1999/47] | English: | SURGE ARRESTER | [1999/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES SURTENSIONS | [1999/47] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.1997 | Translation filed | 28.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 28.08.1998 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 11.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 27.01.2006 | [2008/48] | Cited in | International search | [A]US3856242 (COOK B) |