EP0828962 - TUBE FITTING AND ASSEMBLY METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal Tubular Systems, Inc. 525 Beer Road Mansfield Ohio 44906-1280 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states Universal Tubular Systems, Inc. 525 Beer Road Mansfield, Ohio 44906-1280 / US | ||
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states Universal Enterprises, Inc. 525 Beer Road Mansfield, OH 44906-1280 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIDENOUR, Ralph, G. 626 Lexington-Ontario Road Mansfield, OH 44903 / US | 02 /
KERR, Dennis, W. 712 Cleveland Avenue Ashland, OH 44805 / US | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 97905913.6 | 11.02.1997 | [1998/12] | WO1997US02164 | Priority number, date | US19960635024 | 19.04.1996 Original published format: US 635024 | [1998/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9740306 | Date: | 30.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0828962 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0828962 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16L13/14 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
F16L13/146 (EP,US);
F16L13/143 (EP,US);
F16L13/165 (EP,US);
F16L13/166 (EP,US);
F16L33/2076 (EP,US);
F16L33/2078 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | GB [1998/12] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNG VON ROHREN UND VERFAHREN ZUM ASSEMBLIEREN | [1998/12] | English: | TUBE FITTING AND ASSEMBLY METHOD | [1998/12] | French: | RACCORD DE TUBE ET PROCEDE D'ASSEMBLAGE | [1998/12] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.1998 | Search fee paid | 09.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 10.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US4585255 (RIDENOUR RALPH G [US]); | [Y]US4844516 (BAKER WALTER [US]); | [Y]US546314 ; | [Y]US3834743 (STRYBEL R) |