EP0904347 - BIOFILM INCUBATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University Technologies International Inc. Suite 204 609 - 14th Street N.W. Calgary, Alberta T2N 2A1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATIONAL INC. Suite 204, 609 - 14th Street N.W. Calgary, Alberta T2N 2A1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CERI, Howard 3824 Brooklyn Crescent N.W. Calgary, Alberta T2N 1N4 / CA | 02 /
OLSON, Merle, Edwin 5420 Dalrymple Crescent N.W. Calgary, Alberta, T3A 1R3 / CA | 03 /
MORCK, Douglas, Walter Apt. 4306-800 Tower Lane Drive Airdrie, Alberta, Canada T4B 2L1 / CA | 04 /
READ, Ronald, Rae 63 Millband Close S.W. Calgary, Alberta T2Y 2E9 / CA | 05 /
BURET, Andre, Gerald 4523 - 41 Street N.W. Calgary, Alberta T3A 0N3 / CA | [1999/19] |
Former [1999/13] | 01 /
CERI, Howard 3824 Brooklyn Crescent N.W. Calgary, Alberta T2N 1N4 / CA | ||
02 /
OLSON, Merle, Edwin 5420 Dalrymple Crescent N.W. Calgary, Alberta, T3A 1R3 / CA | |||
03 /
MORCK, Douglas, Walter 208 Mountain Circle Airdrie, Alberta T4A 1X4 / CA | |||
04 /
READ, Ronald, Rae 63 Millband Close S.W. Calgary, Alberta T2Y 2E9 / CA | |||
05 /
BURET, Andre, Gerald 4523 - 41 Street N.W. Calgary, Alberta T3A 0N3 / CA | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/13] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97906060.5 | 12.03.1997 | [1999/13] | WO1997CA00171 | Priority number, date | US19960614593 | 13.03.1996 Original published format: US 614593 | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9733972 | Date: | 18.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0904347 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0904347 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/14 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
B01L3/50853 (EP,US);
C12M23/38 (EP,US);
C12M25/06 (EP,US);
C12M27/16 (EP,US);
C12M35/04 (EP,US);
C12N9/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/13] | Title | German: | INKUBATION VON BIOFILMEN | [2004/34] | English: | BIOFILM INCUBATION | [1999/13] | French: | INCUBATION DE BIOFILMS | [1999/13] |
Former [1999/13] | INKUBATION VON BIOFILMEN. | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 27.03.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.08.2005 | BE | 03.08.2005 | CH | 03.08.2005 | FI | 03.08.2005 | LI | 03.08.2005 | NL | 03.08.2005 | DK | 03.11.2005 | GR | 03.11.2005 | SE | 03.11.2005 | ES | 14.11.2005 | PT | 03.01.2006 | IE | 13.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | [2007/17] |
Former [2006/46] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1221896 (ANKH LAB) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2956931 (SIDNEY GOLDBERG) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]GB1245035 (GL UPRAVLENIE PROIZV BAKTERIIN [RU]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]GB1522128 (BENNETT J) [A] 1* figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4115200 (ANDERSON JOSEPH A) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4483925 (NOACK WILLIAM L [US]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [AP]US5605836 (CHEN CHIN-YU [TW], et al) [AP] 1-3,18 * figure -; claims 1-5 * |