blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0969851

EP0969851 - IMMUNOMODULATORY COMPLEX AND USE THEREOF IN HELICOBACTER DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.04.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOROSSIAN, Fernand Narbey
10, rue Noel-Ballay
F-31400 Toulouse / FR
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Morelle, Guy Georges Alain
Cabinet Morelle & Bardou S.C.
9 Avenue de l'Europe
B.P. 72253
31522 Ramonville Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Morelle, Guy Georges Alain
Cabinet Morelle & Bardou S.C. 9 Avenue de l'Europe B.P. 72253
31522 Ramonville Cedex / FR
Former [2000/02]Morelle, Guy Georges Alain
Cabinet Morelle & Bardou, 5, Bd de la Méditerranée, B.P. 4127
31030 Toulouse Cedex 4 / FR
Application number, filing date97906249.425.02.1997
[2000/02]
WO1997FR00334
Priority number, dateFR1996000244526.02.1996         Original published format: FR 9602445
[2000/02]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9730716
Date:28.08.1997
Language:FR
[1997/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969851
Date:12.01.2000
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969851
Date:26.05.2004
Language:FR
[2004/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.08.1997
ClassificationIPC:A61K35/74, A61K39/106, // (A61K39/106, 31:57, 38:39, 39:108),(A61K35/74, 38:39)
[2000/02]
CPC:
A61K39/105 (EP,US); A61K31/7105 (EP,US); A61K31/715 (EP,US);
A61K35/74 (EP,US); A61K38/39 (EP,US); A61K39/0266 (EP,US);
A61K39/09 (EP,US); A61K39/092 (EP,US); A61K39/102 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US); A61P31/00 (EP); A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP); A61K2039/542 (EP,US); A61K2039/58 (EP,US);
A61K2039/70 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
A61K31/7105, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/715, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K35/74, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/39, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:IMMUNMODULATORISCHER KOMPLEX UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG IN HELICOBACTER ERKRANKUNGEN[2000/02]
English:IMMUNOMODULATORY COMPLEX AND USE THEREOF IN HELICOBACTER DISEASES[2000/02]
French:COMPLEXE IMMUNOMODULATEUR ET SON UTILISATION DANS LES AFFECTIONS PAR HELICOBACTER[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase21.09.1998National basic fee paid 
21.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.09.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.09.1998Examination requested  [2000/02]
01.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2004Fee for grant paid
23.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
09.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
26.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI26.05.2004
NL26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
PT26.10.2004
[2008/07]
Former [2006/13]FI26.05.2004
NL26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
Former [2005/18]FI26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
Former [2005/02]FI26.05.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0035429  (FABRE SA PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1-10 * column W *;
 [DX]WO9422462  (TOROSSIAN FERNAND NARBEY [FR]) [DX] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - FAURE G. ET AL., "Use of Bacterial Ribosomal Immunostimulators in Respiratory Tract Infections", CLINICAL IMMUNOTHERAPEUTICS, (1995), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 138 - 146, XP000609056 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.