EP0883920 - BURIED HETEROSTRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON (publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON (publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ÖHLANDER, Ulf Pilgatan 11 S-112 23 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
RASK, Michael Knallebergsv. 8E S-178 35 Ekerö / SE | 03 /
STOLTZ, Björn Birger Jarlsgatan 102A S-114 20 Stockholm / SE | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Rosenquist, Per Olof, et al Bergenstråhle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | Rosenquist, Per Olof, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB, P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 97906382.3 | 25.02.1997 | [1998/51] | WO1997SE00317 | Priority number, date | SE19960000744 | 27.02.1996 Original published format: SE 9600744 | [1998/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9732377 | Date: | 04.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0883920 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0883920 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/22 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
H01S5/30 (KR);
H01S5/2275 (EP,US);
H01S2301/173 (EP,US);
H01S5/18308 (EP,US);
H01S5/2205 (EP,US);
H01S5/2224 (EP,US);
H01S5/3211 (EP,US);
H01S5/34306 (EP,US);
H01S5/3434 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/51] | H01S3/19 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/51] | Title | German: | VERGRABENE HETEROSTRUKTUR | [1998/51] | English: | BURIED HETEROSTRUCTURE | [1998/51] | French: | HETEROSTRUCTURE ENFOUIE | [1998/51] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 26.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 23.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50] | Request for further processing for: | 11.06.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 11.06.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.06.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 18.12.2002 | IT | 18.12.2002 | NL | 18.12.2002 | ES | 27.06.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/04] | FI | 18.12.2002 | |
NL | 18.12.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 18.12.2002 | |
NL | 18.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 18.12.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4955031 (JAIN FAQUIR C [US]); | [A]US5331655 (HARDER CHRISTOPH [CH], et al); | [A]US5349596 (MOLVA ENGIN [FR], et al); | [A]US5381434 (BHAT RAJARAM [US], et al) | Examination | US4602371 |