Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3850883B | Global Dossier | 29.11.2006 | B2 | JP2000503498 | 21.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US60392396 | 22.02.1996 | US9702192 | 12.02.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0823161 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2004 | B1 | EP0823161 | 11.02.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60392396 | 22.02.1996 | US9702192 | 12.02.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69731692T | 09.06.2005 | T2 | DE69731692D1 | 30.12.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US60392396 | 22.02.1996 | US9702192 | 12.02.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9731446 | Global Dossier | 28.08.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60392396 | 22.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4028575B | Global Dossier | 26.12.2007 | B2 | JP2006203951 | 03.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US60392396 | 22.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5931967 | 03.08.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US60392396 | 22.02.1996 |