11.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
23.09.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] |
29.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] |
24.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] |
10.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] |
20.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
23.07.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] |
21.05.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] |
09.04.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |
27.02.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] |
13.02.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] |
06.02.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] |
02.08.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] |
31.07.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
31.07.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.03.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.04.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
23.04.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.04.2002 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
13.04.2002 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
26.03.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
26.03.2002 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
14.01.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
31.07.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.04.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.09.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
31.08.2000 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
24.07.2000 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
20.04.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.04.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.12.1999 |
First examination report |
|
17.12.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.06.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] |
18.06.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] |
03.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.07.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.02.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.04.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|