Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1918697 | Global Dossier | 11.05.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | CA9700181 | 18.03.1997 | US73078496 | 16.10.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0932847 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2003 | B1 | EP0932847 | 04.08.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA9700181 | 18.03.1997 | US73078496 | 16.10.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE250236T | 15.10.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | CA9700181 | 18.03.1997 | US73078496 | 16.10.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69724979D1 | 23.10.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CA9700181 | 18.03.1997 | US73078496 | 16.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9816861 | Global Dossier | 23.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73078496 | 16.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5771087 | 23.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US73078496 | 16.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA978308 | 24.03.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | US73078496 | 16.10.1996 |