EP0892928 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURE OF A GMR BRIDGE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/04] | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURE OF A GMR BRIDGE SENSOR AND A GMR BRIDGE SENSOR | ||
[2000/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUMANN, Christian Hohenstaufenstrasse 28 D-71696 Möglingen / DE | 02 /
MARX, Klaus Österfeldstrasse 62 D-70563 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
JOST, Franz Schönbuchstrasse 30B D-70565 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
FREITAG, Martin Kapellenstrasse 17c D-53797 Lohmar / DE | 05 /
SENGHAAS, Dietmar Bunsenstrasse 7 D-74080 Heilbronn / DE | [1999/04] | Application number, filing date | 97907011.7 | 23.01.1997 | [1999/04] | WO1997DE00110 | Priority number, date | DE1996114460 | 12.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19614460 | [1999/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9739364 | Date: | 23.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0892928 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0892928 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/09, H01L43/12 | [1999/04] | CPC: |
G01R33/09 (EP,KR,US);
H10N50/01 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49034 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GMR-BRÜCKENSENSORS | [2000/49] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURE OF A GMR BRIDGE SENSOR | [2000/49] | French: | PROCEDE POUR FABRIQUER UN CAPTEUR A PONT A EFFET DE RAPPORT MAGNETORESISTIF GEANT (GMR) | [2000/49] |
Former [1999/04] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GMR-BRÜCKENSENSORS SOWIE GMR-BRÜCKENSENSOR | ||
Former [1999/04] | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURE OF A GMR BRIDGE SENSOR AND A GMR BRIDGE SENSOR | ||
Former [1999/04] | PROCEDE POUR FABRIQUER UN CAPTEUR A PONT A EFFET DE RAPPORT MAGNETORESISTIF GEANT (GMR), ET CAPTEUR A PONT GMR AINSI OBTENU | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/04] | 10.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0622781 (IBM [US]); | Examination | WO9638739 |